Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/21/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 03/21/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 03/25/2013
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 04/15/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 04/26/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 05/06/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 05/06/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 05/06/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 05/06/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 05/06/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/06/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 05/06/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/06/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/06/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 05/06/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 05/06/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12] 05/06/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 05/06/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/06/2013
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 05/06/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/06/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 05/06/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/06/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 05/06/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 05/06/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 05/06/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/06/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 05/14/2013
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/14/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 06/03/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/03/2013
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 06/11/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 06/11/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 06/11/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 06/11/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 06/11/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 07/08/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 07/24/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 07/30/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/09/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 09/19/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/19/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 09/19/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 09/19/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 09/19/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 09/19/2013
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 09/19/2013
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 09/19/2013
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-34] 09/19/2013
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 09/19/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 09/19/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 09/19/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/19/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 09/19/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 09/19/2013
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 09/19/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/19/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 09/19/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 09/19/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 09/19/2013
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 09/19/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 09/19/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 09/23/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 09/23/2013
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 09/23/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 09/25/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 09/25/2013
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-31] 09/25/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/28/2013
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 09/28/2013
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 09/28/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 09/28/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 09/28/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/28/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/28/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 09/28/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 09/28/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 09/28/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 09/28/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 09/28/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 09/28/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/28/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 09/28/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 10/11/2013
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 10/11/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 10/11/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 10/11/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 10/11/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 10/23/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/23/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 10/23/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 10/24/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/30/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 10/30/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 10/30/2013
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 10/30/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 11/12/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 11/21/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 12/11/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 12/11/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 12/11/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 01/07/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 01/10/2014
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 01/10/2014
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 01/10/2014
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 01/10/2014
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 01/15/2014
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 01/15/2014
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 01/15/2014
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 01/28/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 01/28/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 02/03/2014
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/03/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 02/06/2014
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 02/11/2014
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 03/25/2014
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 04/03/2014
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 04/03/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 04/07/2014