Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 03/20/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 04/12/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 04/12/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 04/12/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/12/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/12/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5] 04/12/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 04/12/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 04/12/2013
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-31] 04/12/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 04/12/2013
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 04/12/2013
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 04/12/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 04/12/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/12/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 04/12/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 04/12/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/12/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/15/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 04/17/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 04/17/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/17/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 04/26/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 04/26/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 04/26/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 04/26/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 04/26/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 04/26/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 04/26/2013
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 04/26/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 04/26/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 05/07/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 05/07/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 05/07/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/16/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 05/16/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 05/16/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 05/16/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 05/16/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/16/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/16/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 05/16/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/16/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 05/20/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/20/2013
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/20/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 05/21/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/21/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/21/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/21/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/23/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 06/05/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/05/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 06/05/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 06/05/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 06/12/2013
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 06/14/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 06/20/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/20/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 06/20/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/28/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 06/28/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 06/28/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 06/28/2013
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 06/28/2013
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 07/11/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 07/11/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/11/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 07/23/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/23/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/23/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 07/23/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/30/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 07/30/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 07/30/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 07/30/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 08/01/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 08/01/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 08/01/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 08/02/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 08/02/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 09/09/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 09/09/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/09/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 09/17/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 09/28/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/28/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 10/04/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/02/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 12/02/2013
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 12/02/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 12/04/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 01/08/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 01/08/2014
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 01/08/2014
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 01/13/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 02/11/2014
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/25/2014
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 02/26/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/26/2014
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/06/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/11/2014
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 03/25/2014
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/08/2014
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 04/08/2014
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 04/08/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 04/08/2014