Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 03/19/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 03/19/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 03/21/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 04/10/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 04/10/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 04/10/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 04/10/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 04/10/2013
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 04/10/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 04/10/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/10/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 04/10/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 04/11/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 04/11/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 04/11/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 04/11/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/11/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 04/15/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 04/16/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 04/17/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 04/23/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 04/23/2013
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 04/23/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 04/23/2013
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 04/23/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 04/24/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 04/25/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 04/26/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 04/26/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/03/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/03/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 05/03/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 05/03/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/03/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/03/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/03/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 05/06/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 05/06/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 05/07/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/07/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 05/08/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 05/08/2013
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 05/08/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/08/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 05/08/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 05/08/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 05/09/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 05/09/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 05/14/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/14/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 05/14/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/15/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 05/15/2013
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 05/15/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 05/16/2013
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 05/16/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 05/16/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/16/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 05/17/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/22/2013
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 05/22/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 06/03/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 06/03/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 06/05/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 06/05/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 06/06/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 06/06/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 06/06/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/11/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 06/11/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 06/11/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/12/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 06/12/2013
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/14/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/17/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 06/18/2013
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 06/18/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 06/20/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/25/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 06/26/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 06/27/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/27/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 06/27/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 06/27/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 06/28/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/28/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/28/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/08/2013
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 07/08/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 07/08/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 07/08/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/08/2013
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/10/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/10/2013
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 07/16/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 07/17/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 07/18/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/18/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 07/18/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 07/18/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 07/19/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 07/22/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/22/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 07/22/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/23/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 07/23/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 07/23/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 07/24/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 07/24/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 07/25/2013
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 07/30/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 07/30/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 07/30/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 07/30/2013
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 07/31/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 07/31/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 08/01/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 08/01/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 08/01/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 08/02/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 08/02/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 09/09/2013
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 09/09/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/09/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 09/09/2013
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/09/2013
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 09/10/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 09/11/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 09/12/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 09/12/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 09/12/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 09/12/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 09/12/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 09/12/2013
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 09/12/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 09/17/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 09/17/2013
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 09/19/2013
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 09/19/2013
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 09/20/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 09/20/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/25/2013
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 09/25/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 09/25/2013
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 09/25/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 09/27/2013
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 10/01/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 10/01/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/04/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 10/07/2013
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 10/22/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 10/23/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/30/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 11/12/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 11/13/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 11/14/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 11/14/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 11/18/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 11/18/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 11/21/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 12/03/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 12/05/2013
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 12/09/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 12/10/2013
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 12/12/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 12/12/2013
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 12/16/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 01/13/2014
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 01/13/2014
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 01/15/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 01/16/2014
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 01/27/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 02/04/2014
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/04/2014
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 02/05/2014
Rep. McAllister, Vance M. [R-LA-5] 02/06/2014
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 02/10/2014
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 02/21/2014
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 02/21/2014
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 02/21/2014
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 02/25/2014
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/25/2014
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 02/27/2014
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 02/27/2014
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 02/28/2014
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 02/28/2014
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 02/28/2014
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 03/04/2014
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 03/04/2014
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 03/05/2014
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 03/11/2014
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 03/11/2014
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 03/13/2014
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/24/2014
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/25/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 04/08/2014