Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3]* 03/19/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 03/19/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 04/09/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 04/09/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 04/09/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/09/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 04/23/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 05/07/2013
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 06/04/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 06/04/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/09/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 09/12/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 11/12/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 11/12/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 11/19/2013