Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42]* 03/15/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 04/16/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 06/05/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 06/14/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 06/14/2013
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 06/14/2013
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/20/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 06/20/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/28/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 06/28/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 06/28/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/28/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 06/28/2013
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 07/11/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/18/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 07/31/2013
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/31/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 07/31/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 10/09/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 11/13/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 11/13/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 11/13/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 12/04/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 12/11/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 12/11/2013
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 12/11/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 12/11/2013
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 01/10/2014
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 04/02/2014
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/02/2014
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 04/09/2014