Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 04/12/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 04/12/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 04/12/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 05/07/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 05/07/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 05/07/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/16/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 05/16/2013
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 05/16/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 05/16/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 05/17/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 05/20/2013