Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 03/15/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 03/15/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 03/19/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 03/19/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 03/19/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 03/19/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 03/21/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 03/21/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 03/21/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 04/09/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 04/09/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 04/15/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/15/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 04/18/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 04/24/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/24/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 04/26/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 05/07/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12] 05/07/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 05/07/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/07/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 05/14/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 05/23/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/04/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 06/04/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/04/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/04/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/06/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 06/06/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/13/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 06/13/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/13/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/20/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 06/20/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 06/25/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 06/28/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/19/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 07/25/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 07/25/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 08/02/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 09/06/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 09/10/2013
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 09/12/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 09/19/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 10/10/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 10/10/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 10/29/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 10/30/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 12/11/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 01/10/2014
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 02/14/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 03/06/2014
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/06/2014
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/06/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 03/06/2014
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 03/06/2014
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 03/06/2014
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/14/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/26/2014
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 03/26/2014
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/26/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 04/04/2014