Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 03/15/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/09/2013
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 04/09/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/22/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/22/2013
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 06/25/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 07/16/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 07/16/2013
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 02/10/2014
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 04/04/2014