Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 03/18/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 03/18/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 03/25/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 03/25/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 03/25/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/25/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 03/25/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 04/24/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 04/24/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 04/24/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 04/24/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 04/24/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 05/09/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 05/09/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/09/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 05/09/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/09/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 05/09/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 05/09/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 05/09/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 05/09/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 05/09/2013
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 05/17/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 05/17/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/17/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 05/23/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 06/06/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/06/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/06/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/06/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/06/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/06/2013
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-13] 06/20/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 06/20/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 06/20/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/20/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 06/20/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 06/20/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 06/20/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 06/26/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/26/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 06/26/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 06/28/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 06/28/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/28/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 07/11/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 07/11/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 07/11/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 07/19/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 07/19/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 07/19/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 07/19/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 08/02/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 08/02/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 08/02/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 08/02/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 08/02/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 08/02/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 08/02/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 08/02/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 08/02/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 09/12/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/12/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 09/12/2013
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 09/12/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 09/30/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 09/30/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 10/16/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 10/16/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 10/16/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 10/16/2013
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 11/18/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 11/18/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 11/18/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 11/18/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 11/18/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 11/18/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 11/18/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 11/18/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 12/12/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 12/12/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 12/12/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 12/12/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 12/12/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 12/12/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 01/10/2014
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 01/10/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 01/10/2014
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 01/10/2014
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 03/14/2014
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 03/14/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/14/2014
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/14/2014
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/18/2014
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 03/25/2014
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/25/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 03/25/2014
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 04/04/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 04/04/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 04/04/2014