Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 03/14/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/14/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 05/20/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 05/23/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 06/11/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 06/11/2013
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 07/09/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/16/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 07/17/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 07/18/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 07/23/2013
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/25/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 07/31/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 08/01/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 09/18/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 09/25/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 10/28/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 11/13/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 12/05/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 12/19/2013
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 01/08/2014
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 01/10/2014
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 02/14/2014
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 03/11/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 03/27/2014