Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 03/14/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 03/14/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-31]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 04/10/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 04/10/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 04/18/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/19/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 04/19/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 04/19/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 04/23/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 04/23/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 04/23/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/23/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 04/26/2013
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/06/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 05/06/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 05/06/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 05/06/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 05/07/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 05/07/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/08/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 05/08/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 05/09/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/09/2013
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-45] 05/14/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 05/14/2013
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 05/14/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 05/14/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/14/2013
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 05/14/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/15/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 05/16/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/16/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 05/17/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 05/17/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/22/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 05/23/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 05/23/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 05/23/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 06/03/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 06/05/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 06/06/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 06/11/2013
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 06/11/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/12/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 06/18/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 06/28/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/09/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 09/09/2013
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 09/09/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 09/09/2013