Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 03/14/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 03/15/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 03/18/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/11/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/24/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/25/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 04/25/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 05/09/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 05/15/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/20/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/03/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 06/03/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/04/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 06/05/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 06/13/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 07/31/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 09/10/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/15/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 11/15/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 01/27/2014
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 02/05/2014