Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 03/20/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/20/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 03/20/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/20/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 03/25/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 03/25/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/25/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 03/25/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 04/09/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 04/09/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 04/09/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 04/09/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 04/09/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/09/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 04/09/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/09/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 04/09/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 04/10/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 04/10/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/10/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 04/11/2013
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/11/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 04/11/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 04/11/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/12/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/12/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 04/12/2013
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 04/12/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 04/12/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 04/12/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 04/15/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 04/16/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 04/16/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 04/16/2013
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 04/16/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 04/16/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/18/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 04/18/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 04/18/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 04/23/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 04/23/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/23/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 04/23/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 04/23/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 04/24/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 04/24/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 04/30/2013
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-45] 04/30/2013
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 04/30/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 04/30/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 05/03/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5] 05/03/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 05/03/2013
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 05/03/2013
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 05/03/2013
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 05/06/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 05/06/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 05/07/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 05/07/2013
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 05/07/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 05/08/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 05/08/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 05/13/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 05/13/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/13/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 05/13/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 05/13/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 05/15/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 05/15/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 05/16/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 05/16/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/16/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 05/17/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 05/17/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 05/20/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/23/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/03/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 06/03/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 06/04/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/12/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 06/12/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 06/17/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/17/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 06/17/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 06/18/2013