Refine your search

Date Major Actions
07/12/2013 Became Public Law No: 113-17.
07/12/2013 Signed by President.
07/02/2013 Presented to President.
06/27/2013 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S5509)
06/18/2013 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 424 - 0 (Roll no. 250).(text: CR H3706)
03/14/2013 Introduced in House