Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 03/14/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/09/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 04/09/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/09/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 04/09/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 04/09/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 04/10/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 04/11/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/15/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 04/15/2013
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 05/08/2013
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/14/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/22/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 05/23/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 06/03/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 06/04/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/04/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 06/05/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 06/12/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 06/13/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 06/14/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 06/14/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 06/18/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 06/18/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/18/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/20/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/25/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/26/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 07/08/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 07/08/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/10/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 08/02/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 09/06/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 09/25/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 09/28/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 09/28/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 10/28/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 01/27/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 01/28/2014
Rep. McAllister, Vance M. [R-LA-5] 02/25/2014
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 03/10/2014
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 03/11/2014
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 03/26/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 03/26/2014
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 03/28/2014
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/01/2014
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 04/08/2014