Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/19/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 04/11/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 05/08/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 05/08/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 11/21/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 11/21/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 01/13/2014
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/12/2014
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 03/12/2014