Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 03/13/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/13/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 03/13/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 03/13/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17]* 03/13/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 03/19/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 03/19/2013
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 03/19/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 03/19/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 03/19/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 03/19/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 03/19/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 03/19/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/19/2013
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 04/09/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 04/09/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 04/09/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/11/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 04/17/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 04/23/2013
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 05/06/2013
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 05/09/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 05/15/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 05/21/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 06/05/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 06/25/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 09/09/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 09/26/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 09/30/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 01/28/2014