Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 01/15/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 01/15/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 01/15/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 01/15/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 01/15/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 01/15/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 01/15/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 01/15/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 01/15/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 01/15/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/15/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 01/15/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 01/15/2013
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 01/15/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 01/15/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 01/15/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 01/15/2013
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 01/15/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 01/15/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 01/15/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 01/15/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 01/15/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 01/15/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 01/22/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 01/22/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 01/22/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 01/22/2013
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 01/22/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 01/22/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/05/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 02/05/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/05/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/05/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 02/05/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 02/05/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 02/05/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 02/05/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/05/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/05/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/05/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 02/05/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/12/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/12/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 02/12/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/12/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 02/12/2013
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 02/12/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 02/14/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/14/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 02/14/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/25/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 02/25/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/25/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 05/13/2013