Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/20/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/17/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/09/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/11/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 08/02/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 09/11/2013

Show cosponsors who withdrew