Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 01/22/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-12] 01/23/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 01/23/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 02/04/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 02/06/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 02/12/2013
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-34] 02/12/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 02/13/2013