Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 04/17/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 06/03/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 07/16/2013
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 07/16/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 07/16/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 07/16/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 07/17/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/17/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 07/17/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/17/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 07/17/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/17/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/17/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/17/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 07/18/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/18/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/18/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 07/19/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 07/19/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 07/19/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 07/22/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 07/22/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/22/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 07/22/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 07/22/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/24/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 07/24/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 07/31/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 07/31/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 07/31/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 08/02/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 09/09/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 09/20/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 09/25/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 09/26/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 09/26/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 09/30/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/30/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 10/28/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 10/28/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 10/28/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 10/30/2013