Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/19/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/19/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 03/19/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/19/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/19/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 03/19/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 03/19/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 03/19/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/19/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 03/19/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 03/19/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/11/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 04/11/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 04/11/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 04/11/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 04/11/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/11/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/11/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 04/11/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/11/2013
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 04/11/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/11/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 04/11/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 04/23/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/23/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 04/23/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 04/23/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 04/23/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 04/23/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/23/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/23/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 04/23/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 04/23/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 04/23/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 04/23/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 04/23/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 04/24/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 05/06/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 05/06/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 05/06/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 05/06/2013
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 05/06/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/06/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/06/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/08/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 05/08/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 05/08/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 05/14/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 05/14/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 05/14/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/14/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/21/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 05/21/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 05/21/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/21/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 05/22/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/05/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/14/2013