Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50]* 03/12/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 03/18/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 03/18/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/18/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 03/18/2013
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 03/18/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/18/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 03/18/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/18/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/20/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 04/09/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 04/09/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 04/11/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 04/11/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 04/11/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 04/25/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 04/25/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/20/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 05/21/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/08/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 07/08/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 07/08/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/17/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 07/19/2013
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 07/19/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 07/23/2013
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 07/23/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 07/23/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 07/23/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 07/25/2013
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 07/25/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 07/25/2013
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 07/25/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 07/30/2013
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 07/30/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 07/30/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 07/30/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 07/30/2013
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 08/01/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 08/01/2013
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 08/01/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 08/02/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 08/02/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 08/02/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 08/02/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 08/02/2013
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 09/10/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 09/10/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 09/12/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 10/22/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 10/22/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 10/28/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 10/28/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 10/30/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 11/12/2013
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 11/12/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 11/13/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 12/03/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 12/09/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 12/19/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 01/07/2014
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 01/08/2014
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 01/10/2014
Rep. McAllister, Vance M. [R-LA-5] 01/14/2014
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 01/27/2014
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 01/28/2014
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 01/28/2014
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 01/31/2014
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 02/04/2014
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 02/05/2014
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/10/2014
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 02/11/2014
Rep. Sanford, Mark [R-SC-1] 02/11/2014
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 02/25/2014
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 02/27/2014
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 02/27/2014
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 03/13/2014
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 03/13/2014
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 03/25/2014
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 03/25/2014
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 03/25/2014
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/25/2014