Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 03/12/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 03/13/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 03/20/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/21/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 09/10/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 01/28/2014
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 02/06/2014