Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/11/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 03/12/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 03/12/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 03/12/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 03/12/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 03/12/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 03/12/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 03/12/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 03/12/2013
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 03/12/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 03/13/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 03/13/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/13/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 03/14/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 03/14/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 03/14/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 03/14/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/14/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/14/2013
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 03/14/2013
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 03/14/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/14/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 03/15/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 03/15/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 03/15/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 03/15/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 03/15/2013
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 03/15/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 03/15/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 03/15/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/15/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 03/15/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 03/18/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/18/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 03/18/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 03/19/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 03/19/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 03/20/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 04/11/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 05/22/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 10/08/2013