Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10]* 03/11/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3]* 03/11/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16]* 03/11/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 03/11/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/18/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/18/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 03/18/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 03/18/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 03/18/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 03/19/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 03/19/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 03/19/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 03/19/2013
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 03/19/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 03/20/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 03/20/2013
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 03/21/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 03/21/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 03/21/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/09/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 04/09/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 04/09/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 04/09/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 04/11/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 04/11/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 04/12/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 04/15/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/15/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 04/15/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 04/23/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 04/23/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 04/23/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 04/23/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 04/25/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 05/06/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 05/08/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 05/15/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 05/15/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 05/22/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 06/04/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 06/10/2013