Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 03/07/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 03/12/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 03/12/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/13/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 03/15/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/18/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 03/18/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 03/19/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/19/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 03/19/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 03/20/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 03/20/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 03/20/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 03/21/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 03/21/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 04/10/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/10/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 04/10/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 04/10/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 04/11/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 04/12/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 04/15/2013
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 04/15/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 04/15/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 04/16/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 04/17/2013
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 04/17/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 04/17/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 04/17/2013
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 04/23/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 04/23/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 04/23/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/23/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 04/24/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 04/24/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 05/06/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/06/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 05/06/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 05/07/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/08/2013
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 05/09/2013
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/04/2013