Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 05/07/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 05/07/2013
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 05/16/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 05/23/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 06/03/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 06/13/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 07/17/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 07/23/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 07/25/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 07/30/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 07/31/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 07/31/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 09/09/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 10/03/2013