Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 03/12/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 03/12/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/18/2013
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 03/19/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/19/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 03/19/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/20/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 03/25/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 04/09/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 04/09/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 04/10/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 04/10/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 04/11/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/15/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 04/15/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 04/15/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/15/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 04/16/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 04/16/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/16/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 04/16/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/23/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 04/23/2013
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 04/23/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/23/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 04/24/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 04/24/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/24/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 04/25/2013
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 04/25/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 04/25/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 04/25/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 04/25/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 04/25/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 04/25/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/25/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 04/25/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 04/25/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 04/30/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 04/30/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 04/30/2013
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 04/30/2013
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 04/30/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 04/30/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/30/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 04/30/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 05/06/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 05/06/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 05/07/2013
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 05/07/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/07/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 05/08/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 05/08/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 05/08/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 05/08/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 05/09/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 05/09/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/09/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/09/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 05/09/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 05/14/2013
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 05/14/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/14/2013
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 05/14/2013
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 05/14/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 05/14/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 05/15/2013
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 05/15/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/16/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/16/2013
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 05/16/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 05/16/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 05/20/2013
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 05/20/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 05/20/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 05/20/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 05/22/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 05/22/2013
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 05/22/2013
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-45] 05/22/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 05/23/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 05/23/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 06/05/2013
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 06/05/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 06/05/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 06/05/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 06/06/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/11/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 06/11/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 06/11/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/19/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/19/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 06/20/2013
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 06/25/2013
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 06/25/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 06/25/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 06/26/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 06/28/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 07/08/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 07/08/2013
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 07/08/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 07/08/2013
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 07/09/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 07/09/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 07/09/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 07/10/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 07/10/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 07/10/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 07/16/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 07/17/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 07/18/2013
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 07/18/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 07/23/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/24/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 07/24/2013
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 07/30/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 07/30/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 07/30/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/30/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 07/30/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 07/30/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/30/2013
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 07/31/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 08/01/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 08/01/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 08/01/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 08/02/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 09/06/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/06/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 09/06/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 09/11/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 09/12/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 09/12/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 09/17/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/17/2013
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 09/18/2013
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 09/18/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 10/22/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 10/22/2013
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 10/22/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 10/22/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 10/24/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 10/24/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 10/29/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/29/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/12/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 11/12/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 11/12/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 11/13/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 11/14/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 11/15/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 11/15/2013
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 11/19/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 12/03/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 12/05/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 12/11/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 12/12/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 12/12/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 01/08/2014
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 01/13/2014
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 01/15/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 01/21/2014
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 01/27/2014
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 01/31/2014
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 02/05/2014
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 02/05/2014
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 02/10/2014
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 02/10/2014
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 02/11/2014
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 02/11/2014
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 02/11/2014
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 02/21/2014
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 02/27/2014
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/28/2014
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 03/11/2014
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/12/2014
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 03/14/2014
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 03/24/2014
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 03/26/2014
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 03/26/2014
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 04/01/2014
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/08/2014
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 04/08/2014
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 04/09/2014
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 04/10/2014
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 04/10/2014