Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/15/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/20/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/17/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/07/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/24/2013