Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/07/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 06/18/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 06/28/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 07/11/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 12/12/2013