Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/12/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 03/12/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 03/13/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 03/13/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 03/14/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 03/20/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 03/20/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 03/21/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/21/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 03/21/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 03/21/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 04/10/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 04/10/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 04/10/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 04/10/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 04/10/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 04/10/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 04/10/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 04/10/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 04/12/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 04/12/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 04/12/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/17/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 04/24/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 05/07/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 05/07/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 05/16/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/16/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 05/16/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/16/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/16/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/22/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 05/23/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 05/23/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 06/12/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 06/12/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/25/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/25/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 06/27/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/27/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 06/28/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 07/08/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/08/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 07/08/2013
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 07/08/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/08/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 07/08/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 07/09/2013
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 07/09/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 07/09/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 07/09/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 07/09/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/09/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 07/09/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 07/09/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 07/11/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 07/11/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/17/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/17/2013
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 07/17/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/19/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 07/19/2013
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 07/19/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 07/23/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/23/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 08/01/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 08/02/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 09/10/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 09/10/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 09/10/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 09/19/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/10/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 02/25/2014