Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 03/06/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/07/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 03/07/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 03/07/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 03/07/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 03/07/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/07/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/07/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 03/07/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 03/07/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/07/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/07/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 03/07/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 03/07/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/07/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/13/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 03/13/2013
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 03/13/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/13/2013
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 03/21/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 03/21/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 03/21/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/21/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 03/21/2013
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 04/10/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 04/10/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/10/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 04/10/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/10/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 04/10/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 04/11/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/11/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/06/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/06/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/15/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/15/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/15/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 05/15/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 05/15/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 05/15/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/15/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/15/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 05/15/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 05/21/2013
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/21/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 06/25/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 07/17/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/09/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 10/22/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 12/19/2013
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 01/08/2014
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 03/12/2014
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/12/2014
Rep. McAllister, Vance M. [R-LA-5] 03/13/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/26/2014
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/26/2014
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 04/03/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 04/03/2014
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 04/08/2014