Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (03/02/2011)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Authorizes expenditures by the following Senate committees from March 1, 2011-September 30, 2011, October 1, 2011-September 30, 2012, and October 1, 2012-February 28, 2013: (1) Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry; (2) Armed Services; (3) Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs; (4) Budget; (5) Commerce, Science, and Transportation; (6) Energy and Natural Resources; (7) Environment and Public Works; (8) Finance; (9) Foreign Relations; (10) Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions; (11) Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs; (12) Judiciary; (13) Rules and Administration; (14) Small Business and Entrepreneurship; (15) Veterans' Affairs; (16) Special Committee on Aging; (17) Select Committee on Intelligence; and (18) Indian Affairs.

Authorizes establishment of a special reserve within funds in the account "Expenses of Inquiries and Investigations," appropriated by the legislative branch appropriations Acts for FY2011-FY2013, to be available to any committee to meet specified unpaid obligations or expenses.