Text: S.Res.609 — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

There is one version of the bill.

Bill text available as:

Shown Here:
Agreed to Senate (12/05/2012)


Formatting necessary for an accurate reading of this legislative text may be shown by tags (e.g., <DELETED> or <BOLD>) or may be missing from this TXT display. For complete and accurate display of this text, see the PDF or HTML/XML.




[Congressional Bills 112th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]
[S. Res. 609 Agreed to Senate (ATS)]

112th CONGRESS
  2d Session
S. RES. 609

 Calling for the immediate and unconditional release of United States 
   citizen Alan Phillip Gross from detention in Cuba and urging the 
           Government of Cuba to address his medical issues.


_______________________________________________________________________


                   IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

                            December 5, 2012

Mr. Moran (for himself, Mr. Cardin, Mr. Lugar, Ms. Mikulski, Mr. Rubio, 
 Mr. Menendez, Mr. Durbin, Mr. Blunt, Mr. Lieberman, Mr. Bingaman, Mr. 
Heller, Mr. Kohl, Mr. Nelson of Florida, Mr. Whitehouse, Mr. Kirk, Mr. 
Wyden, Mrs. Feinstein, Mrs. Hutchison, Mr. Boozman, Mr. Blumenthal, Mr. 
 Casey, Mr. Warner, Mr. Johnson of South Dakota, Mrs. Boxer, Mr. Brown 
   of Ohio, Mr. Cornyn, Mr. Coburn, Mr. Lautenberg, Mr. Portman, Mr. 
 Coons, Mr. Toomey, and Mr. Reed) submitted the following resolution; 
                   which was considered and agreed to

_______________________________________________________________________

                               RESOLUTION


 
 Calling for the immediate and unconditional release of United States 
   citizen Alan Phillip Gross from detention in Cuba and urging the 
           Government of Cuba to address his medical issues.

Whereas, Alan Phillip Gross, a citizen of the United States, was born in New 
        York on May 2, 1949, and is a resident of the State of Maryland;
Whereas Mr. Gross has devoted his professional life to helping others through 
        his work in international development and has served in more than 50 
        countries and territories worldwide;
Whereas, in 2001, Mr. Gross founded JBDC, LLC to support Internet connectivity 
        in locations with little or no access;
Whereas, on February 10, 2009, JBDC, LLC received a subcontract with the United 
        States Agency for International Development (USAID);
Whereas, working as a subcontractor for the United States Agency for 
        International Development, Mr. Gross sought to establish wireless 
        networks and improve Internet and Intranet access and connectivity for a 
        small, peaceful, non-dissident, Cuban Jewish community;
Whereas Mr. Gross made 5 trips to Cuba in furtherance of the United States 
        Agency for International Development project he was subcontracted to 
        support;
Whereas the last time Mr. Gross was in the United States was on November 24, 
        2009;
Whereas Mr. Gross was arrested on December 3, 2009, in Havana, Cuba;
Whereas Mr. Gross was detained without charge for 14 months;
Whereas Mr. Gross was charged in February 2011 with ``actions against the 
        independence or the territorial integrity of the state'';
Whereas Mr. Gross's trial lasted only 2 days, after which he was sentenced to 15 
        years in prison;
Whereas Mr. Gross and his wife Judy have 2 daughters, one of which was diagnosed 
        with breast cancer in 2010;
Whereas Mr. Gross's 90-year old mother was diagnosed with inoperable cancer in 
        February 2011;
Whereas, in 2011, Mr. Gross's wife Judy underwent surgery, causing her to miss 
        considerable time from work and putting further financial strain on 
        their family;
Whereas Mr. Gross is 63 years old and has lost more than 105 pounds since being 
        detained in Cuba;
Whereas Mr. Gross has developed degenerative arthritis in his leg and a mass 
        behind his shoulder;
Whereas the Government of Cuba has denied requests by Mr. Gross for an 
        independent medical examination;
Whereas Mr. Gross's legal representative filed an appeal to the Working Group on 
        Arbitrary Detention of the United Nations in August 2012; and
Whereas, since Mr. Gross was detained by the Government of Cuba on December 3, 
        2009, his health has severely deteriorated and his family members have 
        suffered health and financial problems: Now, therefore, be it
    Resolved, That the Senate--
            (1) calls for the immediate and unconditional release of 
        United States citizen Alan Phillip Gross; and
            (2) urges the Government of Cuba in the meantime to provide 
        all appropriate diagnostic and medical treatment to address the 
        full range of medical issues facing Mr. Gross and to allow him 
        to choose a doctor to provide him with an independent medical 
        assessment.
                                 <all>