Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE]* 02/28/2011
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 03/01/2011
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/02/2011
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 03/02/2011
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 03/02/2011
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 03/02/2011
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 03/03/2011
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 03/03/2011
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 03/03/2011
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 03/03/2011
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 03/07/2011
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 03/07/2011
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 03/07/2011
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 03/07/2011
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 03/07/2011
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 03/08/2011
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 03/15/2011
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 04/07/2011
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 04/13/2011
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 06/08/2011
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 06/09/2011