Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 05/12/2011
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 05/12/2011
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 05/12/2011
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 05/12/2011
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 05/12/2011
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 05/12/2011
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 05/12/2011
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 05/12/2011
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 05/12/2011
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 05/12/2011
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 05/25/2011
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 05/26/2011
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 06/09/2011
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/23/2011
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 06/30/2011
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 06/30/2011
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 07/05/2011
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 07/07/2011
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 07/07/2011
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 07/13/2011
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 07/26/2011
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 09/07/2011
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 09/07/2011
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 09/23/2011
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 10/03/2011
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 10/17/2011
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 10/19/2011
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 10/20/2011
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 10/31/2011
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 11/02/2011
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 12/12/2011

Show cosponsors who withdrew