Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 04/13/2011
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL]* 04/13/2011
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR]* 04/13/2011
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 04/13/2011
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 04/13/2011
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 04/13/2011
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 04/13/2011
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 04/13/2011
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND]* 04/13/2011
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 04/13/2011
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 04/13/2011
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 04/13/2011
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 04/13/2011
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 05/02/2011
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 05/02/2011
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 05/02/2011
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 05/05/2011
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 05/05/2011
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA] 05/05/2011
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 05/16/2011
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 05/16/2011
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 05/16/2011
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 05/24/2011
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 05/24/2011
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 05/24/2011
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 06/08/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 06/08/2011
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 06/08/2011
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 06/09/2011
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 06/09/2011
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 06/13/2011
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 06/13/2011
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 06/16/2011
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 06/22/2011
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 09/06/2011
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 09/08/2011
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 11/14/2011