Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 04/12/2011
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 04/12/2011
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 05/18/2011
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 06/09/2011
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 06/23/2011
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 06/23/2011
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 06/27/2011
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 07/11/2011
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 07/11/2011
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 07/11/2011
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 07/19/2011
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 07/19/2011
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 07/20/2011
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 08/01/2011
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 09/06/2011
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 09/21/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 10/03/2011
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 10/06/2011
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 11/07/2011
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 12/12/2011
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 03/27/2012