Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA]* 03/17/2011
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 03/17/2011
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 03/17/2011
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 03/17/2011
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 05/17/2011
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 06/23/2011
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 09/26/2011
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 10/03/2011
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 12/01/2011
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 03/28/2012
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 06/05/2012