Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 04/12/2011
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 05/10/2011
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 05/11/2011
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 05/11/2011
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 05/11/2011
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 05/16/2011
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 05/16/2011
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 05/18/2011
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 05/18/2011
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 05/19/2011
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/22/2011
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 11/29/2011
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 12/14/2011
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 01/23/2012
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 05/17/2012