Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 02/17/2011
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 06/08/2011
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 06/08/2011
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 10/03/2011
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 11/14/2011
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 01/23/2012
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 03/06/2012