Refine your search

Date Major Actions
01/14/2013 Became Public Law No: 112-279.
01/14/2013 Signed by President.
01/02/2013 Presented to President.
01/01/2013 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7528)
12/19/2012 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S8230)
12/19/2012 Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S8230)
11/14/2012 Introduced in Senate