Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 09/19/2012
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA]* 09/19/2012
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 09/19/2012
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 09/19/2012
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 09/19/2012
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 09/19/2012
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 09/19/2012
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 09/19/2012
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 09/21/2012
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 11/13/2012
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 11/27/2012
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 11/30/2012