Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 08/01/2012
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/19/2012
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 09/19/2012
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 09/21/2012
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 11/13/2012
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 11/15/2012