Refine your search

  • S.Amdt.2382   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To require the Federal Crop Insurance Corporation to provide crop insurance for organic crops under similar terms and conditions to crop insurance provided for other crops.
    Sponsor: Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] (Submitted 06/12/2012) (Proposed 06/20/2012)
    Latest Action: 06/20/12 Amendment SA 2382 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 63 - 36. Record Vote Number: 140.
  • S.Amdt.2362   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] (Submitted 06/12/2012)
  • S.Amdt.2311   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] (Submitted 06/11/2012)
  • S.Amdt.2306   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] (Submitted 06/11/2012)
  • S.Amdt.2252   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] (Submitted 06/11/2012)
  • S.Amdt.2206   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] (Submitted 06/07/2012)
  • S.Amdt.2199   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To repeal a duplicative program relating to inspection and grading of catfish.
    Sponsor: Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] (Submitted 06/07/2012) (Proposed 06/19/2012)
    Latest Action: 06/19/12 Amendment SA 2199 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
  • S.Amdt.2156   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To strike a reduction in the supplemental nutrition assistance program and increase funding for the fresh fruit and vegetable program, with an offset that limits crop insurance reimbursements to providers.
    Sponsor: Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] (Submitted 06/06/2012) (Proposed 06/19/2012)
    Latest Action: 06/19/12 Amendment SA 2156 not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 33 - 66. Record Vote Number: 135. (text as modified: CR S4277-4278)