Refine your search

  • S.Amdt.2455   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To require the Office of Management and Budget, the President, and the Department of Defense to submit detailed reports to Congress on effects of defense and nondefesne budget sequestration for fiscal year 2013.
    Sponsor: Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] (Submitted 06/18/2012) (Proposed 06/21/2012)
    Latest Action: 06/21/12 Amendment SA 2455 as modified agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (text as modified: CR S4385-4386)
  • S.Amdt.2311   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] (Submitted 06/11/2012)
  • S.Amdt.2306   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] (Submitted 06/11/2012)
  • S.Amdt.2252   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] (Submitted 06/11/2012)
  • S.Amdt.2206   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] (Submitted 06/07/2012)
  • S.Amdt.2188   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] (Submitted 06/06/2012)
  • S.Amdt.2187   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To extend eligibility for certain emergency loans to commercial fishermen.
    Sponsor: Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] (Submitted 06/06/2012) (Proposed 06/19/2012)
    Latest Action: 06/19/12 Amendment SA 2187 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
  • S.Amdt.2162   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] (Submitted 06/06/2012)
  • S.Amdt.2156   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To strike a reduction in the supplemental nutrition assistance program and increase funding for the fresh fruit and vegetable program, with an offset that limits crop insurance reimbursements to providers.
    Sponsor: Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] (Submitted 06/06/2012) (Proposed 06/19/2012)
    Latest Action: 06/19/12 Amendment SA 2156 not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 33 - 66. Record Vote Number: 135. (text as modified: CR S4277-4278)