Refine your search

Date Major Actions
08/28/2012 By Senator Stabenow from Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry filed written report under authority of the order of the Senate of 08/02/2012. Report No. 112-203. Additional views filed.
06/21/2012 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate, under the order of 6/18/2012, having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, with amendments by Yea-Nay Vote. 64 - 35. Record Vote Number: 164.
05/24/2012 Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry. Original measure reported to Senate by Senator Stabenow. Without written report.
05/24/2012 Introduced in Senate