Refine your search

  • S.Amdt.2152   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] (Submitted 05/23/2012)
  • S.Amdt.2150   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] (Submitted 05/23/2012)
  • S.Amdt.2147   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] (Submitted 05/22/2012)
  • S.Amdt.2146   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To amend the Controlled Substances Act to place synthetic drugs in Schedule I.
    Sponsor: Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] (Submitted 05/22/2012) (Proposed 05/24/2012)
    Latest Action: 05/24/12 Amendment SA 2146 as modified agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (text as modified: CR S3546)
  • S.Amdt.2145   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To facilitate the development of recommendations on interoperability standards to inform and facilitate the exchange of prescription information across State lines.
    Sponsor: Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] (Submitted 05/22/2012) (Proposed 05/24/2012)
    Latest Action: 05/24/12 Amendment SA 2145 as modified agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
  • S.Amdt.2144   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] (Submitted 05/22/2012)
  • S.Amdt.2143   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To amend the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act concerning claims about the effects of foods and dietary supplements on health-related conditions and disease, to prohibit employees of the Food and Drug Administration from carrying firearms and making arrests without warrants, and to adjust the mens rea of certain prohibited acts under the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act to knowing and willful.
    Sponsor: Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] (Submitted 05/22/2012) (Proposed 05/23/2012)
    Latest Action: 05/24/12 Motion to table amendment SA 2143 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 78 - 15. Record Vote Number: 107.
  • S.Amdt.2138   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] (Submitted 05/22/2012)
  • S.Amdt.2133   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] (Submitted 05/22/2012)
  • S.Amdt.2132   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To provide that a portion of the performance awards of each employee of the Center for Drug Evaluation and Research, the Center for Devices and Radiological Health, and the Center for Biologics Evaluation and Research be connected to an evaluation of the employee's contribution to goals under the user fee agreements.
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 05/22/2012) (Proposed 05/23/2012)
    Latest Action: 05/24/12 Proposed amendment SA 2132 withdrawn in Senate. (consideration: CR S3547)
  • S.Amdt.2131   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To require an independent assessment of the Food and Drug Administration's review of drug applications.
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 05/22/2012) (Proposed 05/23/2012)
    Latest Action: 05/24/12 Amendment SA 2131 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
  • S.Amdt.2130   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To ensure transparency in Food and Drug Administration user fee agreement negotiations.
    Sponsor: Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] (Submitted 05/22/2012) (Proposed 05/23/2012)
    Latest Action: 05/24/12 Proposed amendment SA 2130 withdrawn in Senate. (consideration: CR S3563)
  • S.Amdt.2129   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To provide deadlines for the issuance of certain regulations and to require a GAO report on the implementation of the clinical trial registration and reporting requirements under the Public Health Service Act.
    Sponsor: Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] (Submitted 05/22/2012) (Proposed 05/23/2012)
    Latest Action: 05/23/12 Amendment SA 2129 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
  • S.Amdt.2121   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To provide employee protections for the Commissioned Corps of the Public Health Service Act.
    Sponsor: Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] (Submitted 05/21/2012) (Proposed 05/23/2012)
    Latest Action: 05/23/12 Amendment SA 2121 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
  • S.Amdt.2120   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] (Submitted 05/21/2012)
  • S.Amdt.2116   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] (Submitted 05/21/2012)
  • S.Amdt.2115   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] (Submitted 05/21/2012)
  • S.Amdt.2114   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] (Submitted 05/21/2012)
  • S.Amdt.2108   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To prohibit approval by the Food and Drug Administration of genetically engineered fish unless the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration concurs with such approval.
    Sponsor: Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] (Submitted 05/17/2012) (Proposed 05/23/2012)
    Latest Action: 05/24/12 Amendment SA 2108, under the order of 5/23/12, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 46 - 50. Record Vote Number: 106.
  • S.Amdt.2107   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To allow the importation by individuals of safe and affordable drugs from Canada.
    Sponsor: Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] (Submitted 05/17/2012) (Proposed 05/24/2012)
    Latest Action: 05/24/12 Amendment SA 2107, under the order of 5/23/12, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 43 - 54. Record Vote Number: 108.