Refine your search

  • S.Amdt.2465 to S.Amdt.2464 (which amends S.Amdt.2463)   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: Of a perfecting nature.
    Sponsor: Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] (Submitted 06/21/2012) (Proposed 06/21/2012)
    Latest Action: 06/25/12 SA 2465 fell when SA 2464 fell.
  • S.Amdt.2464 to S.Amdt.2463   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: Of a perfecting nature.
    Sponsor: Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] (Submitted 06/21/2012) (Proposed 06/21/2012)
    Latest Action: 06/25/12 SA 2464 fell when SA 2463 fell.
  • S.Amdt.2463   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To change the enactment date.
    Sponsor: Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] (Submitted 06/21/2012) (Proposed 06/21/2012)
    Latest Action: 06/25/12 SA 2463 (instructions to the motion to refer) fell when cloture invoked on the motion to concur in the House amendment to the bill (S.3187).
  • S.Amdt.2462 to S.Amdt.2461   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: Of a perfecting nature.
    Sponsor: Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] (Submitted 06/21/2012) (Proposed 06/21/2012)
    Latest Action: 06/26/12 SA 2462 fell when SA 2461 withdrawn. (consideration: CR S4626)
  • S.Amdt.2461   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To change the enactment date.
    Sponsor: Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] (Submitted 06/21/2012) (Proposed 06/21/2012)
    Latest Action: 06/26/12 Proposed amendment SA 2461 withdrawn in Senate. (consideration: CR S4626)
  • S.Amdt.2151   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To amend the Controlled Substances Act to make any substance containing hydrocodone as schedule II drug.
    Sponsor: Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] (Submitted 05/23/2012) (Proposed 05/23/2012)
    Latest Action: 05/23/12 Amendment SA 2151 as modified agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. (text as modified: CR S3506)
  • S.Amdt.2149   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] (Submitted 05/22/2012)
  • S.Amdt.2148   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] (Submitted 05/22/2012)
  • S.Amdt.2142   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To modify and limit certain exemptions to the Freedom of Information Act.
    Sponsor: Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] (Submitted 05/22/2012) (Proposed 05/24/2012)
    Latest Action: 05/24/12 Amendment SA 2142 as modified agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. (text as modified: CR S3545-3546)
  • S.Amdt.2141   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To require the Commissioner of Food and Drugs to report to Congress on issues with respect to small businesses.
    Sponsor: Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] (Submitted 05/22/2012) (Proposed 05/23/2012)
    Latest Action: 05/23/12 Amendment SA 2141 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
  • S.Amdt.2140   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] (Submitted 05/22/2012)
  • S.Amdt.2139   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] (Submitted 05/22/2012)
  • S.Amdt.2137   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] (Submitted 05/22/2012)
  • S.Amdt.2136   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] (Submitted 05/22/2012)
  • S.Amdt.2135   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] (Submitted 05/22/2012)
  • S.Amdt.2134   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] (Submitted 05/22/2012)
  • S.Amdt.2128   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] (Submitted 05/22/2012)
  • S.Amdt.2127   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To require manufacturers of dietary supplements to register dietary supplement products with the Food and Drug Administration.
    Sponsor: Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] (Submitted 05/22/2012) (Proposed 05/23/2012)
    Latest Action: 05/24/12 Motion to table amendment SA 2127 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 77 - 20. Record Vote Number: 110.
  • S.Amdt.2126   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To make effective the proposed rule of the Food and Drug Administration relating to sunscreen drug products.
    Sponsor: Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] (Submitted 05/21/2012) (Proposed 05/23/2012)
    Latest Action: 05/23/12 Amendment SA 2126 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
  • S.Amdt.2125   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To ensure that adequate information is disseminated to health care providers and payors about the potential benefits and risks of medical products on all patient populations, particularly underrepresented subpopulations, including racial subgroups.
    Sponsor: Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] (Submitted 05/21/2012) (Proposed 05/23/2012)
    Latest Action: 05/23/12 Amendment SA 2125 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
  • S.Amdt.2122   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: In the nature of a substitute.
    Sponsor: Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] (Submitted 05/21/2012) (Proposed 05/23/2012)
    Latest Action: 05/23/12 Amendment SA 2122 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
  • S.Amdt.2119   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] (Submitted 05/21/2012)
  • S.Amdt.2118   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] (Submitted 05/21/2012)
  • S.Amdt.2117   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] (Submitted 05/21/2012)
  • S.Amdt.2111   — 112th Congress (2011-2012)

    Description: To provide substantial savings in health care costs to the Federal government and consumers by fostering competition among generic pharmaceutical manufacturers and ensuring that anti-competitive "pay-for-delay" settlements between brand-name and generic pharmaceutical manufacturers do not block generic drugs from entering the market.
    Sponsor: Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] (Submitted 05/17/2012) (Proposed 05/24/2012)
    Latest Action: 05/24/12 Amendment SA 2111, under the order of 5/23/12, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 28 - 67. Record Vote Number: 105.